Reports for Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG
- Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in St. Moritz.
- The management has one active person registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 28.07.2011.
- In the commercial register the company Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.225.223.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: BLUE Events GmbH, Elaval AG, Immobiliengesellschaft Muntanella AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.03.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Moritz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.006.650-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.225.223
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Vermögenswerten und Vermittlung von Geschäften aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Joachim Schweiger | St. Moritz | <2004 | 27.07.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6276108, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG, in St. Moritz, CH-350.3.006.650-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 17.03.2000, S. 1820).
Statutenänderung:
23.05.2011.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Vermögenswerten und Vermittlung von Geschäften aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 24.05.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhandbüro Joachim Schweiger, in St. Moritz, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Targa Immobilien und Verwaltungs AG, in S t . M o r i t z, Via Traunter Plazzas 5, 7500 St. Moritz, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
7.03.2000.
Zweck:
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Vermögenswerten und Vermittlung von Geschäften aller Art;
die Gesellschaft kann sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen und jede Tätigkeit ausüben, welche im Bereiche des Geschäftszweckes liegt, kann Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und verwalten, kann sich an Unternehmungen gleicher oder ähnlicher Art in irgendeiner Form beteiligen oder selbst solche Unternehmungen gründen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1 000.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch einmalige Publikation im SHAB oder durch eingeschriebenen Brief, sofern die Adressen aller Aktionäre der Gesellschaft bekannt sind.
Eingetragene Personen:
Messerli, André, von Kaufdorf, in St. Moritz, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Treuhandbüro Joachim Schweiger, in St. Moritz, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.