Reports for swisstinnitus ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout swisstinnitus ag
- swisstinnitus ag has its legal headquarters in Sarnen and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of medical and dental practices».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- On the 24.11.2021 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company swisstinnitus ag is registered under the UID CHE-367.439.218.
- Companies with the same address as swisstinnitus ag: as-energie GmbH, Boschung Global AG, Brandegg AG.
Management (2)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Prof. Dr. med. Markus Hermann Fidelis Pfister,
Gertrud Anna Dorothea Demmel
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.05.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.004.676-7
UID/VAT
CHE-367.439.218
Sector
Operation of medical and dental practices
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist Forschung, Diagnostik und Therapie für Hör- und Tinnitusrehabilitation. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- swisstinnitus ltd
- swisstinnitus sa
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: swisstinnitus ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005341191, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
swisstinnitus ag, in Sarnen, CHE-367.439.218, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2019, Publ. 1004545218).
Statutenänderung:
15.11.2021.
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 50'000.00]. Das Aktienkapital wurde im Betrag von CHF 50'000.00 nachliberiert.
Publication number: HR02-1004545218, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
swisstinnitus ag, in Sarnen, CHE-367.439.218, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 09.04.2015, Publ. 2086467).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüscher, Daniel, von Moosleerau, in Schöftland, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfister, Prof. Dr. med. Markus Hermann Fidelis, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Sarnen, einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2086467, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
swisstinnitus ag, in Sarnen, CHE-367.439.218, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 15.05.2014, Publ. 1502549).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfister, Prof. Dr. med. Markus Hermann Fidelis, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Sarnen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lüscher, Daniel, von Moosleerau, in Schöftland, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.