Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for swissterminal International AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.05.1984
Deletion from the commercial register
03.07.2024
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Frenkendorf
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.001.156-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.645.887
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Dauernde Beteiligung an Unternehmen der Logistikbranche sowie an sonstigen Handels- und Industrieunternehmungen im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, nutzen und veräussern sowie Grundeigentum erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Stephan Revisions AG | Muttenz | 14.03.2014 | 02.07.2024 | |
Swiss Revision AG | Basel | <2004 | 13.03.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- CONTEBA Container-Terminal Basel AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: swissterminal International AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1006074402, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
swissterminal International AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-100.645.887, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2023, Publ. 1005788798). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die "swissterminal AG" (CHE-112.701.452), in Frenkendorf, über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1006073030, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
swissterminal International AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-100.645.887, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2023, Publ. 1005788798).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der "Schweizerzug AG" (CHE-210.087.529), in Frenkendorf, gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 12.06.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 7'865'203.09 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 7'831'381.13 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Die übernehmende Gesellschaft verfügt gemäss Bestätigung des zugelassenen Revisionsexperten über frei verwendbares Eigenkapital im Umfang des Kapitalverlustes. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1005788798, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
swissterminal International AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-100.645.887, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 15.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2540411).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mayer, Jeannette, von Basel, in Magden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mayer, Roman, von Basel, in Magden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rheinfelden];
Mayer, Mark, von Basel, in Zeiningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rheinfelden, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dischinger, Matthias, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lörrach (DE), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.