Reports for swisscraft medien ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout swisscraft medien ag
- swisscraft medien ag has its legal headquarters in Luzern and is active. It operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting».
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 11.05.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-112.056.255.
- The address is identical with 41 other active companies. These include: A & K Beteiligungs AG, Arvium AG, AWB Group AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.10.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.028.611-5
UID/VAT
CHE-112.056.255
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung und Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Treuhand, Unternehmensberatung, Marketing, Werbung, Design, Kunst, Kommunikation und elektronische Medien; Tätigung von Baumanagement und Leitung von Bauprojekten; Handel mit Waren aller Art; Abwicklung von Import/Export-Geschäften; Tätigung von Immobiliengeschäften aller Art, insbesondere Erwerb, Finanzierung, Verwaltung, Vermietung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum; Kauf, Verwaltung und Verkauf von Patenten und Lizenzen etc.; Abschluss von Darlehensverträgen; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AC&P Management AG | Luzern | 02.11.2004 | 21.01.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: swisscraft medien ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005176841, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
swisscraft medien ag, in Luzern, CHE-112.056.255, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 03.04.2012, S.0, Publ. 6623172).
Statutenänderung:
30.04.2021.
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich (durch Brief, Telefax, E-Mail oder in anderer geeigneter Schriftform).
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]
Publication number: 6623172, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
swisscraft medien ag, in Luzern, CH-100.3.028.611-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 31.03.2010, S. 12, Publ. 5567618).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bättig, Armin W., von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Altergott, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Paderborn (DE), Mitglied, Sekretär und Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaubert-Riemer, Nelly, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5567618, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
swisscraft medien ag, in Luzern, CH-100.3.028.611-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2009, S. 13, Publ. 4838884).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bucher, Patrizia, von Horw und Niederrohrdorf, in Luzern, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bättig, Armin W., von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied];
Altergott, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Paderborn (DE), Mitglied, Sekretär und Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.