Reports for Swiss-International Cigar SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss-International Cigar SA
- Swiss-International Cigar SA has its legal headquarters in Nyon and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading in tobacco products».
- Swiss-International Cigar SA was founded on 06.10.2020.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 24.11.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-314.137.003.
- The address is identical with 7 other active companies. These include: ALTO Swiss Sàrl, AOM Consulting SA, AROL Delta Luxury Intercigar SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.10.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.192.618-3
UID/VAT
CHE-314.137.003
Sector
Trading in tobacco products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but: le commerce (achat, vente, import, export, représentation, distribution) de tous produits dans les domaines liés au tabac, à l'horlogerie et aux spiritueux; la logistique, le transport, le stockage et le gardiennage de cigares; la restauration, l'entretien, l'achat et la vente de pièces de collection et de tous biens culturels liés aux domaines du tabac et de l'artisanat du cigare en général (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss-International Cigar SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005612356, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss-International Cigar SA, à Nyon, CHE-314.137.003 (FOSC du 18.03.2021, p. 0/1005127573). Aazam-Zanganeh Alexis est nommé président. Aazam-Zanganeh Rachel, de Tannay, à Gland, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005127573, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss-International Cigar SA, à Lausanne, CHE-314.137.003 (FOSC du 09.10.2020, p. 0/1004996995). Statuts modifiés le 04.03.2021. Siège transféré à Nyon.
Nouvelle adresse:
Impasse Champ-Colin 6, 1260 Nyon. Drouhet Thierry n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Aazam-Zanganeh Alexis, de Genève, à Gland, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1004996995, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss-International Cigar SA, à Lausanne, Avenue du Grey 38A, 1004 Lausanne, CHE-314.137.003. Nouvelle société anonyme.
Statuts:
28 septembre 2020.
But:
la société a pour but: le commerce (achat, vente, import, export, représentation, distribution) de tous produits dans les domaines liés au tabac, à l'horlogerie et aux spiritueux;
la logistique, le transport, le stockage et le gardiennage de cigares;
la restauration, l'entretien, l'achat et la vente de pièces de collection et de tous biens culturels liés aux domaines du tabac et de l'artisanat du cigare en général (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Administration:
Drouhet Thierry, de Prilly, à Jouxtens-Mézery, avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 28 septembre 2020, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.