Reports for Swiss Drone Show AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss Drone Show AG
- Swiss Drone Show AG with its legal headquarters in Gerolfingen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation». Swiss Drone Show AG is active.
- The management of the company Swiss Drone Show AG consists of 4 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 12.01.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-150.788.767.
Management (4)
newest board members
Marc Loosli,
Patrick Marcel Kobel,
Reto Bertschi,
Stephan René Kobel
newest authorized signatories
Marc Loosli,
Patrick Marcel Kobel,
Reto Bertschi,
Stephan René Kobel
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.08.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Täuffelen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.078.665-0
UID/VAT
CHE-150.788.767
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Events, Informatik und Drohnen, insbesondere Entwicklung, Vermietung und Verkauf. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss Drone Show AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005932673, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Swiss Drone Show AG, in Täuffelen, CHE-150.788.767, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 20.04.2020, Publ. 1004873333).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zahnd, Joris Sandor, von Schwarzenburg, in Gerolfingen (Täuffelen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004873333, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Swiss Drone Show AG, in Täuffelen, CHE-150.788.767, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2019, Publ. 1004704850).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zahnd, Joris Sandor, von Schwarzenburg, in Gerolfingen (Täuffelen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR01-1004704850, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Swiss Drone Show AG, in Täuffelen, CHE-150.788.767, Scheuermattstrasse 4b, 2575 Gerolfingen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
22.08.2019.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Events, Informatik und Drohnen, insbesondere Entwicklung, Vermietung und Verkauf. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
10'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre:
per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 03./08.08.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Bertschi, Reto, von Dürrenäsch, in Mörigen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Loosli, Marc, von Eriswil, in Gerolfingen (Täuffelen), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kobel, Patrick Marcel, von Lützelflüh, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kobel, Stephan René, von Lützelflüh, in Kallnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.