Reports for Swiss Club
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss Club
- Swiss Club with its legal headquarters in Monthey is active. Swiss Club operates in the sector «Data processing and hosting services».
- The management of the organization Swiss Club consists of 2 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 07.08.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-239.725.227.
- On the same address as Swiss Club there are 30 other active companies registered. These include: AMM Partners Sàrl, BDO SA, Bonaud Groupe SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2022
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Monthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.6.006.262-3
UID/VAT
CHE-239.725.227
Sector
Data processing and hosting services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'association poursuit les buts suivants: - la gestion d'un réseau social et professionnel qui a pour but de favoriser les rencontres, les interactions et les mises en relation entre ses membres; - l'organisation de tout type d'événements qui ont pour but de créer des liens à travers l'échange, le partage, le soutien et/ou la solidarité entre ses membres; - l'exploitation de tout type d'établissements recevant du public. L'association peut réaliser toute activité commerciale, financière, mobilière ou immobilière en relation directe ou indirecte avec ses buts. L'association peut accorder des prêts ou des garanties à ses membres et à des tiers.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss Club
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006101937, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Swiss Club, à Monthey, CHE-239.725.227, association (No. FOSC 213 du 02.11.2022, Publ. 1005596076).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Caillet-Bois, Fabrice, de Val-d'Illiez, à Monthey, membre et secrétaire du comité, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Clerc, David, de Monthey, à Leysin, vice-président du comité, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR01-1005596076, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Swiss Club, à Monthey, CHE-239.725.227, Route des Iles 1, 1870 Monthey, association (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
01.09.2022.
But:
L'association poursuit les buts suivants: - la gestion d'un réseau social et professionnel qui a pour but de favoriser les rencontres, les interactions et les mises en relation entre ses membres;
- l'organisation de tout type d'événements qui ont pour but de créer des liens à travers l'échange, le partage, le soutien et/ou la solidarité entre ses membres;
- l'exploitation de tout type d'établissements recevant du public. L'association peut réaliser toute activité commerciale, financière, mobilière ou immobilière en relation directe ou indirecte avec ses buts. L'association peut accorder des prêts ou des garanties à ses membres et à des tiers.
Ressources:
dons et legs;
parrainage;
subventions publiques et privées;
cotisations versées par les membres;
toute autre ressource autorisée par la loi.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Premand, John, de Troistorrents, à Troistorrents, président du comité, avec signature collective à deux;
Caillet-Bois, Fabrice, de Val-d'Illiez, à Monthey, membre et secrétaire du comité, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.