Address
Voie-des-Traz 20
1215 Genève 15 Aéroport
Branches (1)
Reports for SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA
- SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA with its legal headquarters in Genève 15 Aéroport is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Guard and security services». SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA is active.
- There are 8 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.04.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-114.526.094.
- The address is identical with 17 other active companies. These include: AA DG CONSULT, ARIF, Aircargo Logistics SA, APM Technologies SA.
Management (8)
newest board members
Adriano Antonietti,
Frédéric Michel Dufour,
Alain Camille Jean Augustin Bréau,
Leslie Rose Marie Bréau Meniger
newest authorized signatories
Adriano Antonietti,
Frédéric Michel Dufour,
Rui Ferreira Carneiro,
Romain Gauthier,
Pascal Gamblin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.10.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Le Grand-Saconnex
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.7.169.008-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.526.094
Sector
Guard and security services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une agence de sécurité et de transports de fonds, de biens et de valeurs (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
B&M Audit and Consulting Sàrl | Meyrin | 08.06.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Norman Auditing SA | Genève | 20.09.2019 | 07.06.2021 | |
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 15.08.2014 | 19.09.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Véron Grauer Sécurité SA
- P.P. Sécurité SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006016084, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA, à Le Grand-Saconnex, CHE-114.526.094 (FOSC du 15.02.2024, p. 0/1005962658). Antonietti Adrian est maintenant domicilié à Choulex.
Publication number: HR02-1005962658, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA, à Le Grand-Saconnex, CHE-114.526.094 (FOSC du 27.09.2023, p. 0/1005847282). Fornasier Tito n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Antonietti Adrian, de Sessa, à Nyon, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005847282, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
SVO Swiss Valuable Operations SA, à Le Grand-Saconnex, CHE-114.526.094 (FOSC du 21.07.2023, p. 0/1005801805). Dufour Frédéric, jusqu'ici directeur général, nommé administrateur délégué et directeur, continue à signer collectivement à deux. Signature collective à deux a été conférée à Gauthier Romain, de France, à Divonne-les-Bains, FRA, directeur général et Ferreira Carneiro Rui, du Portugal, à Gland, sous-directeur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.