Address
c/o R. Strub
Moosstrasse 72
8630 Rüti ZH
Reports for SVG Verwaltungen GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SVG Verwaltungen GmbH
- SVG Verwaltungen GmbH with its legal headquarters in Rüti ZH is a Limited liability company from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». SVG Verwaltungen GmbH is active.
- The management of the company SVG Verwaltungen GmbH consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 16.06.1995.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 17.05.2011. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- SVG Verwaltungen GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-108.314.968.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.06.1995
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Rüti (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.001.119-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.314.968
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen auf dem Treuhandsektor der Immobilienbranche, wie Verwaltung und Vermittlung von Liegenschaften, Beratung und Finanzierungsvermittlung; kann auch Grundstücke/Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Strub Verwaltungen GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SVG Verwaltungen GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6164984, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SVG Verwaltungen GmbH, in Rüti ZH, CH-020.4.001.119-3, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2010, S. 24, Publ. 5879612).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Strub-Feuerstein, Barbara, von Chur und Calfreisen, in Rüti ZH, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vettiger, Peter, von Goldingen, in Brissago, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Publication number: 5879612, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SVG Verwaltungen GmbH, in Rüti ZH, CH-020.4.001.119-3, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 24.03.2004, S. 25, Publ. 2183946). Gemäss Erklärung vom 20.10.2010 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Strub-Feuerstein, Barbara, von Chur und Calfreisen, in Rüti ZH, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2183946, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SVG Verwaltungen GmbH, in Rüti ZH, Erbringung von Dienstleistungen auf dem Treuhandsektor der Immobilienbranche, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 05.10.1998, S. 6809).
Statutenänderung:
9.03.2004.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vettiger, Peter, von Goldingen, in Altendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 19'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Strub-Feuerstein, Barbara, von Chur und Calfreisen, in Rüti ZH, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 20'000.-- [bisher: mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--];
Strub, Reto, von Chur, in Rüti ZH, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.