Reports for Suisse 7 GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Suisse 7 GmbH
- Suisse 7 GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Hinwil. Suisse 7 GmbH belongs to the industry «Other construction» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Suisse 7 GmbH, which was founded on the 20.09.2022, consists of 2 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.09.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-187.667.721.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: BONADEA AG, Zweigniederlassung Hinwil, Coiffure Zentrum, Renate Esposito Feudale-Lentini, Praxis Anttila GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.09.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Hinwil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.814.990-7
UID/VAT
CHE-187.667.721
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Bauarbeiten aller Art, insbesondere von Abdichtungsarbeiten. Sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Suisse 7 GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005848372, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Suisse 7 GmbH, in Hinwil, CHE-187.667.721, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2023, Publ. 1005750303).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Prenrecaj, Margarita, kosovarische Staatsangehörige, in Hinwil, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Prenrecaj, Gjoke, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hinwil, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005750458, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Suisse 7 GmbH, in Ebikon, CHE-187.667.721, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2022, Publ. 1005567778). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Hinwil im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Luzern von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005750303, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Suisse 7 GmbH, bisher in Ebikon, CHE-187.667.721, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2022, Publ. 1005567778).
Statutenänderung:
03.05.2023.
Sitz neu:
Hinwil.
Domizil neu:
Dürntnerstrasse 19, 8340 Hinwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Selmanaj, Leonard, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ebikon, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Prenrecaj, Gjoke, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hinwil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.