Reports for Styfologie Center GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Styfologie Center GmbH
- Styfologie Center GmbH with its legal headquarters in Rapperswil SG is active. Styfologie Center GmbH operates in the sector «Technical, physical and chemical testing».
- Styfologie Center GmbH was founded on 17.05.2000.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 04.12.2017.
- In the commercial register the company Styfologie Center GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-105.532.138.
- The address is identical with 3 other active companies. These include: Gut und Schön Fashion GmbH, Riccardo Petrarolo, Schuhe & Accessoires, Styfologie Vertriebs GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.05.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.048.052-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.532.138
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Herstellung und Verkauf von Körper-Statik-Messgeräten sowie die damit verbundenen Behandlungs- und Beratungsdienstleistungen, insbesondere bei Statikabweichungen sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Styfologie Center GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3906313, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Styfologie Center GmbH, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-105.532.138, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 25.08.2009, S. 16, Publ. 5212712).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Morger, Käthy, von Eschenbach SG, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Morger, Otto, von Eschenbach SG, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 18'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00 [bisher: von Eschenbach SG, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Einzelunterschrift und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 18'000.00].
Publication number: 5212712, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Styfologie Center GmbH, in Rapperswil-Jona, CH-320.4.048.052-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 13.08.2007, S. 9, Publ. 4063276). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 19.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Morger, Otto, von Eschenbach SG, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 18'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4063276, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Styfologie Center GmbH, bisher in Rapperswil SG, CH-320.4.048.052-5, Entwicklung, Herstellung und Verkauf von Körper-Statik-Messgeräten usw. Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 23.05.2000, S. 3485).
Sitz neu:
Rapperswil-Jona. [behördliche Umbenennung].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Morger, Käthy, von Eschenbach SG, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 2'000.-- [bisher: in Rapperswil SG];
Morger, Otto, von Eschenbach SG, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 18'000.-- [bisher: in Rapperswil SG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.