Address
c/o Gebhard Klaus
Rotackerstrasse 24
8645 Jona
Reports for Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart
- Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart has its legal headquarters in Jona and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The organization was founded on 17.10.1981 and has 6 persons in its management.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 17.05.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart is registered under the UID CHE-110.391.487.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Linus Bruhin,
Dr. Roman Zieglgänsberger,
Dr. Arta Valstar-Verhoff,
Gebhard Klaus,
David Juda
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Linus Bruhin,
Dr. Roman Zieglgänsberger,
Dr. Arta Valstar-Verhoff,
Gebhard Klaus,
David Juda
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1981
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.020.828-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.391.487
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Das künstlerische Werk von August Friedrich Wilhelm Vordemberge, genannt Vordemberge-Gildewart zu erhalten und an Studierende der bildenden Künste Stipendien auszurichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG, Zweigniederlassung Rapperswil SG | Rapperswil-Jona | 05.10.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Vordemwalde-Gildewart
- Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005748614, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-110.391.487, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 08.02.2021, Publ. 1005094620).
Urkundenänderung:
18.04.2023.
Weitere Adressen:
c/o RA lic.iur. Linus Bruhin, Leutschenstrasse 9, 8807 Freienbach [bisher: c/o RA lic.iur. Linus Bruhin, Leutschenstrasse 9, Postfach 323, 8807 Freienbach].
Organisation neu:
[gestrichen]. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderungen erfahren.]
Publication number: HR02-1005094620, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-110.391.487, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 05.11.2019, Publ. 1004752766).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Ostschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (CHE-113.698.580), in St. Gallen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bruhin, Dr. Egon, von Wangen SZ, in Lachen SZ, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Dr. Linus, von Wangen (SZ), in Nuolen (Wangen (SZ)), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien]. [Anpassung der UID der Aufsichtsbehörde aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004752766, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stiftung Vordemberge-Gildewart, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-110.391.487, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2017, S.0, Publ. 3849527).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Helms, Prof. Dietrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruhin, Dr. Linus, von Wangen (SZ), in Nuolen (Wangen (SZ)), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Bruhin, Linus];
Zieglgänsberger, Dr. Roman, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wiesbaden (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.