Reports for Stiftung Vivala
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Vivala
- Stiftung Vivala with its legal headquarters in Weinfelden is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled». Stiftung Vivala is active.
- The management has 11 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 01.07.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Stiftung Vivala is the following: CHE-107.104.641.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Meinrad Rutschmann,
Christoph Walter Rutschmann,
Cornelia Theresia Hauser,
Martina Wüthrich,
Anita Keller-Howald
newest authorized signatories
Christoph Walter Rutschmann,
Manfred Assmann,
Martina Wüthrich,
Cornelia Burgermeister,
Katja Stalder Kaiser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.11.1966
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Weinfelden
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.7.000.883-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.104.641
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt das Führen einer Sonderschule mit Internat für geistig und/oder körperlich beeinträchtigte Kinder sowie Wohnheime mit Beschäftigungsgruppen für geistig und/oder körperlich beeinträchtigte Erwachsene. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinerlei Gewinnabsichten. Die Stiftung kann alle Massnahmen treffen sowie Bestrebungen Dritter unterstützen, die der Verwirklichung des Stiftungszwecks dienen. Innerhalb derselben kann sie Betriebseinheiten bilden und erwerben und diese auch als selbständige juristische Personen führen bzw. betreiben. Sie kann darüber hinaus Dienstleistungen für gleiche oder ähnliche Institutionen erbringen und sich an solchen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Thalmann Treuhand AG | Weinfelden | 28.11.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Friedheim Weinfelden
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Vivala
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005510353, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Vivala, in Weinfelden, CHE-107.104.641, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2022, Publ. 1005421517).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rutschmann, Meinrad, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Konstanz (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005421517, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Vivala, in Weinfelden, CHE-107.104.641, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 06.07.2021, Publ. 1005240856).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schindler, Urs, von Bolligen, in Bottighofen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005240856, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Vivala, in Weinfelden, CHE-107.104.641, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 17.02.2021, Publ. 1005103515).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vock, Martin, von Weinfelden, in Weinfelden, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rutschmann, Christoph Walter, von Winterthur, in Weinfelden, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hauser, Cornelia Theresia, von Häggenschwil, in Weinfelden, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.