Reports for Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg
- Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg with its legal headquarters in Ried-Brig is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled». Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg is active.
- The management of the organization Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg consists of 6 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 25.06.2024.
- The organization Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg is registered under the UID CHE-370.378.132.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Marco Decurtins,
Marc Wyssen,
Jürg Kämpfen,
Evelyne Crettaz,
Björn Wyss
newest authorized signatories
Marco Decurtins,
Marc Wyssen,
Jürg Kämpfen,
Evelyne Crettaz,
Björn Wyss
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.2019
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Ried-Brig
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.7.017.626-2
UID/VAT
CHE-370.378.132
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Bau und Betrieb von betreuten Seniorenwohnungen in Ried-Brig. Sie kann sämtliche Massnahmen ergreifen, die zum Erreichen dieses Zweckes notwendig sind.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ALPINE REVISIONS AG | Brig-Glis | 01.03.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006066867, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg, in Ried-Brig, CHE-370.378.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2022, Publ. 1005575294).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmidhalter, Herbert, von Ried-Brig, in Ried-Brig, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Decurtins, Marco, von Tujetsch, in Ried-Brig, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten];
Wyssen, Marc, von Naters, in Termen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005575294, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg, in Ried-Brig, CHE-370.378.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2021, Publ. 1005314864).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Carlen, Claudine, von Ried-Brig, in Ried-Brig, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Imhof, Florian, von Ried-Brig, in Ried-Brig, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kämpfen, Jürg, von Ried-Brig, in Ried-Brig, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Decurtins, Marco, von Tujetsch, in Ried-Brig, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005314864, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Residenz Brigerberg, in Ried-Brig, CHE-370.378.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 20.05.2021, Publ. 1005187825).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gsponer, Achim, von Ausserberg, in Termen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Walser, Katja Myriam, von Haldenstein, in Ernen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Crettaz, Evelyne, von Guttet-Feschel, in Ried-Brig, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Imhof, Florian, von Ried-Brig, in Ried-Brig, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.