Reports for Stiftung 'Pro Trogen'
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung 'Pro Trogen'
- Stiftung 'Pro Trogen' is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Trogen.
- Stiftung 'Pro Trogen' has 5 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 25.10.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register AR under the UID CHE-110.384.949.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Elisabeth Roth,
Valentin Micha Surber,
Dr. Heidi Eisenhut,
lic. iur. Werner Rechsteiner
newest authorized signatories
Elisabeth Roth,
Valentin Micha Surber,
Dr. Heidi Eisenhut,
lic. iur. Werner Rechsteiner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.07.1990
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Trogen
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.7.012.068-2
UID/VAT
CHE-110.384.949
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die fachkundige Erhaltung und Verschönerung des unter Schutz gestellten Dorfkerns Trogen und seiner Umgebung zu fördern. Sie sorgt mit Rat und finanzieller Beihilfe für stilgerechte Restaurationen und kann alles unternehmen, was dem Schutz der erhaltenswürdigen Substanz des Dorfkerns Trogen, der Wiederherstellung und Erhaltung seines spezifischen Charakters und der Verbesserung seines Gesamtbildes dient. In begründeten Fällen können auch Restaurationen von ausserhalb des Dorfkerns gelegenen Einzelobjekten in derselben Weise unterstützt werden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bösch Treuhand | Rorschach | 25.10.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Breitenmoser-Edelmann Treuhand AG | St. Gallen | 13.09.2013 | 24.10.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung "Pro Trogen"
- Stiftung «Pro Trogen»
- Stiftung Pro Trogen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung 'Pro Trogen'
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005868725, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Stiftung "Pro Trogen", in Trogen, CHE-110.384.949, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 28.07.2023, Publ. 1005806421).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Breitenmoser-Edelmann Treuhand AG (CHE-103.476.262), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bösch Treuhand (CHE-347.904.123), in Rorschach, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005806421, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Stiftung "Pro Trogen", in Trogen, CHE-110.384.949, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 10.09.2019, Publ. 1004713122).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altherr, Dorothea, von Trogen, in Trogen, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Roth, Elisabeth, von Niederbipp, in Trogen, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004713122, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Stiftung "Pro Trogen", in Trogen, CHE-110.384.949, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2017, Publ. 3352709).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hugentobler, Otto, von Oberuzwil, in St. Gallen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Surber, Valentin, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.