Address
Bahnhofplatz 2, Berner Generationenhaus
3011 Bern
Reports for Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern
- Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern has its legal headquarters in Bern, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern has 11 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 30.08.2024.
- Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-106.067.405.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Corinne Eve Schmidhauser Henauer,
Regula Jauner,
Alois Christoph Liechti,
Bernhard Antener,
Annegret Hebeisen-Christen
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Julien Boris Neruda,
Alois Christoph Liechti,
Bernhard Antener,
Sven Deck
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.02.2000
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.025.007-5
UID/VAT
CHE-106.067.405
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Stiftung ist, das Wohl der älteren Menschen und deren Angehörigen im Kanton Bern zu erhalten und zu verbessern, insbesondere: die Lebensqualität zu sichern, die Selbständigkeit zu erhalten, die Fähigkeiten zu entwickeln, die Selbsthilfe zu fördern, die gesellschaftliche Stellung zu verbessern, die materielle Sicherheit zu gewährleisten, die Anliegen in der Öffentlichkeit zu vertreten. Die Stiftung arbeitet mit Pro Senectute Schweiz sowie mit weiteren Organisationen und Institutionen zusammen, die sich Altersfragen widmen. Sie kann alle Rechtsgeschäfte eingehen und Handlungen vornehmen, die ihren Zielen direkt oder indirekt dienen, namentlich Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern, mieten oder vermieten und Personal einstellen. Sie hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinerlei Gewinnabsichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
unico thun ag | Thun | 10.09.2021 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 30.01.2017 | 09.09.2021 | |
ROD Treuhand AG | Urtenen-Schönbühl | 27.01.2012 | 29.01.2017 | |
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 11.09.2007 | 26.01.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Pro Senectute Region Bern
- Stiftung Pro Senectute Bern-Stadt - Für das Alter
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006118031, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern, in Bern, CHE-106.067.405, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2024, Publ. 1005927247).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Biedermann, Thomas, von Winterthur, in Thunstetten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005927247, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern, in Bern, CHE-106.067.405, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2023, Publ. 1005803179).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schenk, Marcel, von Signau, in Steffisburg, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Neruda, Julien Boris, von Uster, in Bern, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005803179, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Pro Senectute Kanton Bern, in Bern, CHE-106.067.405, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 10.09.2021, Publ. 1005288590).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfister, Peter, von Wangen an der Aare, in Meiringen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidhauser Henauer, Corinne, von Bischofszell, in Interlaken, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.