Address
c/o Patrick Schweizer
Habsburgstrasse 15
3006 Bern
Reports for Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds
- Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds in Bern is a Foundation from the sector «Other social services». Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds is active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 14.06.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-101.287.997.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Patrick Schweizer,
Micael Schweizer,
Bernhard Emanuel Büchler-Hahnloser
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Schweizer,
Micael Schweizer,
Bernhard Emanuel Büchler-Hahnloser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.01.1940
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.016.703-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.287.997
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt: die Förderung von Bestrebungen und Hilfswerken der privaten Fürsorgetätigkeit für arme und hilfsbedürftige Kinder und Erwachsene im Kanton Bern mit einer durch Unfall, Krankheit oder Geburtsgebrechen verursachter körperlicher, geistiger oder psychischer Einschränkung; hilfsbedürftigen, ehrenwerten, tüchtigen, im Kanton Bern wohnhaften Erwachsenen, welche unverschuldet in Not geraten sind, durch Zuwendungen oder zinslose Darlehen die Gründung einer Existenz zu ermöglichen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Accola | Bern | 27.10.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006057001, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds, in Bern, CHE-101.287.997, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2021, Publ. 1005214240).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baur, Beat Dr., von Bern und Oberhofen am Thunersee, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schweizer, Patrick, von Bern, in Bern, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schweizer, Micael, von Steffisburg, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005214240, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds, in Bern, CHE-101.287.997, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2017, Publ. 3771989).
Domizil neu:
c/o Patrick Schweizer, Habsburgstrasse 15, 3006 Bern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baechtold, Rémy, von Osterfingen, in Luins, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3771989, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Luise Müller-Fonds, in Bern, CHE-101.287.997, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2016, Publ. 3233381).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baur, Beat Dr., von Bern und Oberhofen am Thunersee, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Baechtold, Rémy, von Osterfingen, in Luins, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Büchler, Bernhard, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schweizer, Patrick, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.