Reports for Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh
- Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh has its legal headquarters in Lützelflüh-Goldbach and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh, which was founded on the 14.02.1981, consists of 8 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 03.07.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh is the following: CHE-110.196.537.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Thomas Leuenberger,
Anton Niederhauser,
Kurt Baumann,
Barbara Aeberhard-Reist,
Marianne Flückiger
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.02.1981
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Lützelflüh
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.007.854-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.196.537
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Kultur in all ihren gegenwärtigen und zukünftigen Ausdrucksformen, insbesondere durch die praktische Unterstützung des Schaffens auf dem Gebiete der Literatur, der bildenden Kunst, der Architektur, des Kunstgewerbes, des gestaltenden Handwerks, der Musik, des Theaters, des Films, der Fotografie, der kulturellen Wissenschaft und der kulturellen Tätigkeit im allgemeinen, namentlich durch Veranstaltung von Kursen, Vorstellungen, Konzerten und Ausstellungen in der alten Mühle Lützelflüh. Im übrigen vgl. Stiftungsurkunde.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Sutter AG | Langnau im Emmental | 07.03.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Rodio Jolanda, Kulturmühle Lützelflüh
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005784244, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh, in Lützelflüh, CHE-110.196.537, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2022, Publ. 1005381970).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gfeller, Monika, von Worb, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005381970, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh, in Lützelflüh, CHE-110.196.537, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 08.04.2021, Publ. 1005143332).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüdi, Jürg, von Heimiswil, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leuenberger, Thomas, von Trachselwald, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1005143332, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Kulturmühle Lützelflüh, in Lützelflüh, CHE-110.196.537, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2019, Publ. 1004588439).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Budmiger-Stirnemann, Marlies Regula, von Rain und Gränichen, in Oberburg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flückiger, Marianne, von Rohrbach, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Grünenmatt (Lützelflüh)];
Lüdi, Jürg, von Heimiswil, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Leuenberger, Thomas, von Trachselwald, in Lützelflüh-Goldbach (Lützelflüh), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Niederhauser, Anton, von Eriswil, in Rüegsauschachen (Rüegsau), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.