Address
c/o Bauernhof 'Hinter-Musegg'
Diebold-Schilling-Strasse 13
6004 Luzern
Reports for Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg
- Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The organization was founded on 18.03.2013.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 04.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-274.465.060.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Adolf Käppeli,
Deborah Arnold,
Gerold Schatt,
Erika Wermelinger
newest authorized signatories
Adolf Käppeli,
Deborah Arnold,
Gerold Schatt,
Erika Wermelinger,
Irene Wespi
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.03.2013
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.796.053-5
UID/VAT
CHE-274.465.060
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Bestrebungen und Massnahmen zur Erhaltung, zum Schutz und zur Pflege des kulturellen Erbes, der natürlichen Umwelt und der heimischen Tierwelt an der Musegg; Betrieb des Bauernhof 'Hinter-Musegg' und Förderung des allgemeinen Verständnisses für kulturelle und ökologische Werte in der Öffentlichkeit und Beitrag zur Aufbringung der benötigten Mittel.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | 21.03.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006075512, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg, in Luzern, CHE-274.465.060, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 16.04.2024, Publ. 1006009818).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Dr. Franz, von Sursee und Knutwil, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Käppeli, Adolf, genannt Dölf, von Luzern, in Kriens, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1006009818, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg, in Luzern, CHE-274.465.060, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 31.07.2023, Publ. 1005807268).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Arnold, Deborah, von Beromünster, in Luzern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005807268, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung Kultur- und Lebensraum Musegg, in Luzern, CHE-274.465.060, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2023, Publ. 1005644348).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Thomas, von Flühli, in Neuenkirch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Käppeli, Adolf, genannt Dölf, von Luzern, in Kriens, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.