Address
c/o Urs Tännler
Promenadenstrasse 34
3076 Worb
Reports for Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb
- Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb with its legal headquarters in Worb is active. Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb operates in the sector «Operation of general healthcare facilities».
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- On the 25.03.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-110.399.514.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Frank Heepen,
Marinus Johannes Maria van Beurden,
Karin Waber-Stadler,
Jean-Pierre Peternier,
Urs Tännler
newest authorized signatories
Frank Heepen,
Marinus Johannes Maria van Beurden,
Urs Tännler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.01.1996
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Worb
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.009.300-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.399.514
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Materielle Unterstützung bedürftiger Gemeindeglieder bei Unfall, Krankheit und Altersgebrechlichkeit, sowie materielle Unterstützung der nichtsubventionsberechtigten Spitexdienste in der Einwohnergemeinde Worb.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ROD Treuhand AG | Urtenen-Schönbühl | 07.05.2009 | 13.02.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005993252, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb, in Worb, CHE-110.399.514, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 14.08.2023, Publ. 1005815599).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bigler, Christoph, von Vechigen, in Worb, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heepen, Frank, von Chur, in Schliern b. Köniz (Köniz), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005815599, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb, in Worb, CHE-110.399.514, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2022, Publ. 1005378011).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fuhrer, Patricia, von Trubschachen, in Ried b. Kerzers (Ried bei Kerzers), Mitglied und Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
van Beurden, Marinus, von Speicher, in Kandergrund, Mitglied und Sekretär des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005378011, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Krankenhilfsverein Worb, in Worb, CHE-110.399.514, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 01.04.2021, Publ. 1005139464).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fuhrer, Patricia, von Trubschachen, in Ried b. Kerzers (Ried bei Kerzers), Mitglied und Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Altmann, Patricia, von Davos].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.