Address
c/o Apolloni AG
Gerberngasse 26
3011 Bern
Reports for Stiftung Konzertverein Bern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Konzertverein Bern
- Stiftung Konzertverein Bern is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Bern. Stiftung Konzertverein Bern belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 17.09.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Stiftung Konzertverein Bern is the following: CHE-109.948.822.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christian Abend,
Anne Denise Weibel-Dinichert,
Arthur Apolloni,
Silvia Gränicher-Hippenmeyer
newest authorized signatories
Christian Abend,
Anne Denise Weibel-Dinichert,
Arthur Apolloni,
Silvia Gränicher-Hippenmeyer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.05.1961
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.016.252-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.948.822
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt in erster Linie die Förderung der kulturellen und statutarischen Bestrebungen des Konzertvereins Bern und im Besonderen die Stützung seines Finanzhaushaltes. Die Stiftung kann im Weiteren gesanglich kulturelle Bestrebungen von Chören oder Gesangsanlässen unterstützen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
IKA - Treuhand AG | Bern | 06.01.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftungsfonds des Konzertvereins Bern
- Stifungs-Fonds des Berner Männerchors
- Stiftungs-Fonds des Berner Männerchors
- Stiftungsfonds des Berner Männerchors
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Konzertverein Bern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006131140, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Konzertverein Bern, in Bern, CHE-109.948.822, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 09.01.2024, Publ. 1005928874).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stähli, Markus, von Hofstetten bei Brienz, in Bern, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Abend, Christian, von Winterthur, in Boll (Vechigen), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005928874, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Konzertverein Bern, in Bern, CHE-109.948.822, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 20.07.2023, Publ. 1005799976).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Bernische BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (BBSA).
Publication number: HR02-1005799976, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Konzertverein Bern, in Bern, CHE-109.948.822, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2020, Publ. 1004803691).
Domizil neu:
c/o Apolloni AG, Gerberngasse 26, 3011 Bern.
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Anna-Denise Weibel, Kappelenring 8, 3032 Hinterkappelen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Engel, Peter, von Ligerz und Twann-Tüscherz, in Bern, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Apolloni, Arthur, von Ochlenberg, in Münchenbuchsee, Mitglied und Kassier des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Weibel-Dinichert, Anne Denise, von Meikirch, in Hinterkappelen (Wohlen bei Bern), Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gränicher-Hippenmeyer, Silvia, von Aarau, in Liebefeld (Köniz), Mitglied und Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.