Reports for Stiftung Idaheim Näfels
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Idaheim Näfels
- Stiftung Idaheim Näfels is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Näfels.
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 22.03.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization Stiftung Idaheim Näfels is registered under the UID CHE-110.307.498.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Fridolin Anton Landolt,
Rita Erika Feldmann,
Bruno Fridolin Gallati,
Francesco Stocco,
Peter Gallati-Moon
newest authorized signatories
Fridolin Anton Landolt,
Rita Erika Feldmann,
Francesco Stocco,
Peter Gallati-Moon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.05.1939
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.7.002.777-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.307.498
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Nutzung des der Stiftung zu Eigentum einverleibten Vermögens, insbesondere den Betrieb des Idaheims.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Erich Fischli & Partner KLG | Glarus Nord | 22.03.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
UMBERG TREUHAND AG | Glarus | 29.03.2011 | 21.03.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Idaheim des Tagwens Näfels
- Altersheim und Idaheim der Bürgergemeinde Näfels.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Idaheim Näfels
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005992270, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Stiftung Idaheim Näfels, in Glarus Nord, CHE-110.307.498, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 24.06.2022, Publ. 1005503852).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
UMBERG TREUHAND AG (CHE-106.897.051), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erich Fischli & Partner KLG (CHE-158.209.291), in Näfels (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005503852, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Stiftung Idaheim Näfels, in Glarus Nord, CHE-110.307.498, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 12.11.2018, Publ. 1004495396).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Handelsregister des Kantons Glarus, in Glarus.
Publication number: HR02-1004495396, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Stiftung Idaheim Näfels, in Glarus Nord, CHE-110.307.498, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 03.06.2015, Publ. 2183999).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Feldmann, Rita Erika, von Glarus Nord, in Filzbach (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Näfels (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.