Address
c/o Hansueli Baier
Hartbertstrasse 11
7000 Chur
Reports for Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg
- Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg is currently active and the industry «Other services in education». The legal headquarters are in Chur.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 22.02.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-100.350.417.
- Advokatur und Notariat Dr. Jürg Riedi AG, Davos Resorts SA, Chur, Gemeinnützige Stiftung Mundaun, Chur have the same address as Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.1953
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Chur
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.017-0
UID/VAT
CHE-100.350.417
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Förderung von Bildungs- und Begegnungsmöglichkeiten in naturnaher Umgebung. Wichtige Aufgaben sind insbesondere die Vermittlung und Vertiefung von sozialen, kulturellen und gesellschaftlichen Grundwerten, die Förderung der Frau als Trägerin von Verantwortung in Kultur, Familien und Beruf, insbesondere in ländlichen Strukturen, die Unterstützung von nachhaltigen regionalen Anliegen in Berggebieten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Capol & Partner AG | Chur | 07.07.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung "Hof De Planis"
- Stiftung 'Hof De Planis'
- Annie Bodmer - Abegg - Stiftung
- Bodmer Annie - Abegg - Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005968303, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg, in Chur, CHE-100.350.417, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 17.12.2021, Publ. 1005360376).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Belleri, Gisella, von Cazis, in Rhäzüns, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schlosser-Zihler, Sabina, von Horw, in Felsberg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005360376, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Stiftung "Hof De Planis", in Schiers, CHE-100.350.417, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2016, Publ. 3087529).
Urkundenänderung:
22.10.2021.
Name neu:
Stiftung Annie Bodmer-Abegg.
Sitz neu:
Chur.
Domizil neu:
c/o Hansueli Baier, Hartbertstrasse 11, 7000 Chur.
Zweck neu:
Die Förderung von Bildungs- und Begegnungsmöglichkeiten in naturnaher Umgebung. Wichtige Aufgaben sind insbesondere die Vermittlung und Vertiefung von sozialen, kulturellen und gesellschaftlichen Grundwerten, die Förderung der Frau als Trägerin von Verantwortung in Kultur, Familien und Beruf, insbesondere in ländlichen Strukturen, die Unterstützung von nachhaltigen regionalen Anliegen in Berggebieten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Thöny, Andreas, von Grüsch, in Landquart, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Florian, Rudolf, von Tschiertschen-Praden, in Schiers, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied des Stiftungsrates;
Rickhoff, Carmen, von Basel, in Schiers, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied des Stiftungsrates.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.