Reports for Stiftung für Nutztiere
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung für Nutztiere
- Stiftung für Nutztiere is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Morgarten.
- The organization was founded on 17.01.2019.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 18.04.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZG is CHE-158.884.400.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christof Stelz,
Markus Daniel Bosshard,
Evelyne Priska Hiestand-Bosshard
newest authorized signatories
Christof Stelz,
Markus Daniel Bosshard,
Evelyne Priska Hiestand-Bosshard
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.01.2019
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberägeri
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.7.000.881-9
UID/VAT
CHE-158.884.400
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung für Nutztiere ist eine gemeinnützige, politisch neutrale und unabhängige Stiftung, die "Nutztieren" das Weiterleben nach ihren für die Gesellschaft erbrachten Leistungen, frei von jeglichem Nutzungsanspruch, in artgerechter und behüteter Umgebung ermöglicht. Die Stiftung engagiert sich insbesondere für Tiere, die wirtschaftlich für den Halter nicht mehr von Nutzen sind und dem Schlachthof zugeführt werden sollen und setzt sich allgemein für das Wohl aller Tiere ein; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
blueAUDIT GmbH | Freienbach | 22.01.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung für Nutztiere
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005726196, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stiftung für Nutztiere, in Oberägeri, CHE-158.884.400, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 03.06.2021, Publ. 1005205084).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gmür, Carmen Gabriela, von Gossau (SG), in Geroldswil, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stelz, Christof, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kreuzlingen, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005205084, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stiftung für Nutztiere, in Oberägeri, CHE-158.884.400, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 29.03.2019, Publ. 1004598863).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gmür, Carmen Gabriela, von Gossau (SG), in Geroldswil, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Müller-Kuenzle, Carmen Gabriela].
Publication number: HR02-1004598863, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stiftung für Nutztiere, in Oberägeri, CHE-158.884.400, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2019, Publ. 1004547547).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Eidg. Departement des Innern, in Bern.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.