Reports for Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis 'Juventutem'
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis 'Juventutem'
- Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis 'Juventutem' is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Bern. Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis 'Juventutem' belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- The management consists of one person. The organization was founded on 14.12.2010.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 16.09.2024.
- The organization's UID is CHE-116.355.834.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.12.2010
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.7.049.373-0
UID/VAT
CHE-116.355.834
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Förderung der katholischen Jugendbewegung, insbesondere die Förderung der geistigen und liturgischen Traditionen der katholischen und apostolischen Kirche bei jungen Menschen zwischen 16 und 36 Jahren, mit dem Ziel den Menschen Werte und Halt für ein verantwortungsbewusstes Erwachsenenleben zu geben. Die Stiftung kann zu diesem Zweck Treffen von jungen Katholiken und Katholikinnen fördern, insbesondere das Weltjungendtreffen, sowie jungen Katholiken, die Not leidend sind, Unterstützungen zukommen zu lassen, sei es durch Überlebenshilfe oder Ausbildungsbeiträgen oder zur Unterstützung der Teilnahme an Treffen der jungen Katholiken und Katholikinnen (Reisespesen, Übernachtung etc.). Die Stiftung kann mit der Bewegung Foederatio Internationalis 'Juventutem' zusammenarbeiten. Die Ausrichtung von Mitteln ist aber nicht auf die Mitglieder dieser Bewegung beschränkt. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinen Erwerbszweck.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ANBA Treuhand AG | Sutz-Lattrigen | 20.12.2010 | 26.06.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis 'Juventutem'
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006130059, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis "Juventutem", in Bern, CHE-116.355.834, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 25.11.2019, Publ. 1004766889).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Marti, Cosimo Damiano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004766889, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis "Juventutem", in Bern, CHE-116.355.834, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 13.08.2019, Publ. 1004694676).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Greber, Ronald Guido, von Schötz, in Wabern (Bern), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004694676, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Foederatio Internationalis "Juventutem", in Bern, CHE-116.355.834, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2016, Publ. 3041573).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Greber, Ronald Guido, von Schötz, in Wabern (Bern), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Marti, Cosimo Damiano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].