Address
c/o Universität Bern, Info Flora
Altenbergrain 21
3013 Bern
Reports for Stiftung Dr.h.c. Erich Nelson
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Dr.h.c. Erich Nelson
- Stiftung Dr.h.c. Erich Nelson has its legal headquarters in Bern and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Stiftung Dr.h.c. Erich Nelson has 8 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 28.03.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-102.018.069.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Willy Tinner,
Dr. Philip James William Cribb,
Monika Lüthi,
Lucienne Claudine De Witte,
Christine Föhr
newest authorized signatories
Lucienne Claudine De Witte,
Christophe Nathanaël Bornand,
Steffen Boch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.1989
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.016.891-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.018.069
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Bewahrung und Bearbeitung des künstlerisch-wissenschaftlichen Werks von Dr. h.c. Erich Nelson.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Sidus Treuhand AG | Lyss | 17.02.2012 | 17.04.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Dr. h.c. Erich Nelson
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Dr.h.c. Erich Nelson
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005996741, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Dr. h.c. Erich Nelson, in Bern, CHE-102.018.069, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2023, Publ. 1005676292).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüthi, Monika, von Rüderswil, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Lüthi Zingg, Monika, von Neuchâtel].
Publication number: HR02-1005676292, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Dr. h.c. Erich Nelson, in Bern, CHE-102.018.069, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 30.09.2020, Publ. 1004988937).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jenny, Rudolf, von Glarus, in Allmendingen b. Bern (Allmendingen), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Boch, Steffen, von Münsingen, in Zürich, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Birmensdorf ZH].
Publication number: HR02-1004988937, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Dr. h.c. Erich Nelson, in Bern, CHE-102.018.069, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 18.04.2019, Publ. 1004613536).
Domizil neu:
c/o Universität Bern, Info Flora, Altenbergrain 21, 3013 Bern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stocker, Thomas Franziskus, von Zürich, in Bern, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Boch, Steffen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Birmensdorf ZH, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
de Witte, Lucienne Claudine, von Attinghausen, in Oberwil BL, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Allschwil, Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Föhr, Christine, von Eriswil, in Fraubrunnen, Mitglied und Sekretärin des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Bern, Mitglied + Sekretär, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Cribb, Phillip James William, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Middlesex (UK) (GB), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Jenny, Rudolf, von Glarus, in Allmendingen b. Bern (Allmendingen), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Lüthi Zingg, Monika, von Neuchâtel, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Neuenburg, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Tinner, Willy, von Sennwald, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.