Reports for Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg
- Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Hünibach. Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg belongs to the industry «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities» and is currently active.
- The management of the organization Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg consists of 10 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 06.05.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-107.368.631.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Bruno Gafner,
Luzia Marianne Schmid-Kocher,
Katharina Hämmerle,
Alois Studerus,
Josef Markus Schöpfer
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Karin Oswald,
Katharina Hämmerle,
Alois Studerus,
Remo Philipp Berlinger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.07.1984
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Thun
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.7.002.716-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.368.631
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Bau und Betrieb eines Betagtenheims mit Pflegemöglichkeiten für ca. 45 Pensionäre. Sie nimmt ohne konfessionelle Beschränkung Personen, vorzugsweise aus den Gemeinden, über die sich die römisch-katholische Kirchgemeinde Thun erstreckt, in ihr Heim auf.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gfeller + Partner AG | Bern | 06.05.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 14.02.2018 | 05.05.2024 | |
Finanzinspektorat der Stadt Thun | Thun | 20.06.2008 | 13.02.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006025333, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg, in Thun, CHE-107.368.631, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 05.06.2023, Publ. 1005759842).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Feierabend, Arnold, von Engelberg, in Thun, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
BDO AG (CHE-430.259.378), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gafner, Bruno, von Beatenberg, in Oberhofen am Thunersee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Oswald, Karin, von Oberhofen am Thunersee, in Gunten (Sigriswil), Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gfeller + Partner AG (CHE-151.579.083), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005759842, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg, in Thun, CHE-107.368.631, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 29.05.2020, Publ. 1004899384).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen, Alois Anton, von Luthern, in Uetendorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Luzia Marianne, von Ausserberg, in Gwatt (Thun), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004899384, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Betagtenheim Schönegg, in Thun, CHE-107.368.631, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 18.09.2019, Publ. 1004718451).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lottaz, Alois Hermann Dr., von Rechthalten, in Thun, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Karp, Cäcilia, genannt Cécile, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Hilterfingen, Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studerus, Alois, von Waldkirch, in Thun, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hämmerle, Katharina, genannt Kathrin, von St. Gallen, in Forst b. Längenbühl (Forst-Längenbühl), Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Berlinger, Remo Philipp, von Degersheim, in Hünibach (Hilterfingen), Mitglied und Sekretär des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Borter, Walter, von Ringgenberg (BE), in Thun, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Feierabend, Arnold, von Engelberg, in Thun, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kancz, Daniel, von Wängi, in Forst b. Längenbühl (Forst-Längenbühl), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Schöpfer, Josef Markus, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Thun, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Christen, Alois Anton, von Luthern, in Uetendorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.