Address
c/o Meta Schmidhauser
Schulstrasse 16
8153 Rümlang
Reports for Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang
- Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang has its legal headquarters in Rümlang and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang was founded on 02.05.2002.
- On the 18.01.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang is registered under the UID CHE-109.851.789.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Alfred Lutz,
Werner Gugolz,
Andrea Jäger,
Peter Meier-Neves,
Corinne Lee
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.05.2002
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Rümlang
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.972-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.851.789
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung erstellt und betreibt alters- und behindertengerechte Wohnungen; sie unterstützt moderne Wohnformen wie z.B. betreutes Wohnen und kann auch an dezentralen Orten alters- und behindertengerechte Plätze bereitstellen oder solche Einrichtungen Dritter in geeigneter Weise unterstützen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SMART Audit AG | Wallisellen | 15.05.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005937435, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang, in Rümlang, CHE-109.851.789, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2023, Publ. 1005654802).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
SMART Audit AG (CHE-113.733.549), in Wallisellen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Hasli Audit AG (CHE-113.733.549), in Niederhasli].
Publication number: HR02-1005654802, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang, in Rümlang, CHE-109.851.789, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 12.10.2018, Publ. 1004475280).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scheuber, Beat, von Rümlang, in Rümlang, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Denzler, Kurt, von Dübendorf, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Genovese, Claudio, von Altstätten, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lutz, Alfred, von Wolfhalden, in Rümlang, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jäger, Andrea, von Diepoldsau, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gugolz, Werner, von Rümlang, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004475280, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Alterswohnen Rümlang, in Rümlang, CHE-109.851.789, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 31.07.2014, Publ. 1642617).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hardegger, Thomas, von Rümlang und Gams, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Genovese, Claudio, von Altstätten, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Peter, von Zürich und Oberägeri, in Rümlang, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Kassier, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.