Address
c/o STEWI AG
Sunnehofstrasse 3
8493 Saland
Reports for STEWI Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout STEWI Holding AG
- STEWI Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Saland and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- The company was founded on 19.12.2016.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 19.03.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-366.141.868.
- On the same address as STEWI Holding AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Rovento GmbH, STEWI AG, STEWI of Switzerland AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Mareike Krämer,
Felix Christian Reichardt,
Lorenz Martin Fäh
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bauma
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.044.103-2
UID/VAT
CHE-366.141.868
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die dauernde Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmungen aller Art im In- und Ausland und die Finanzierung von mit der Gesellschaft verbundenen und nahestehenden Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stewi Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: STEWI Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005988654, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stewi Holding AG, in Zollikon, CHE-366.141.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2023, Publ. 1005852916).
Statutenänderung:
11.03.2024.
Firma neu:
STEWI Holding AG.
Sitz neu:
Bauma.
Domizil neu:
c/o STEWI AG, Sunnehofstrasse 3, 8493 Saland.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Publication number: HR02-1005852916, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stewi Holding AG, in Zollikon, CHE-366.141.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 16.07.2019, Publ. 1004676503). Gemäss Erklärung vom 05.09.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ebnöther, Stephan Raymond, von Vorderthal, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
OBT AG (CHE-334.580.117), in Brugg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krämer, Mareike, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Thal, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Reichardt, Felix Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stetten (SH), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004676503, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stewi Holding AG, in Zollikon, CHE-366.141.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2017, Publ. 3947377).
Statutenänderung:
02.07.2019.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 120'510.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 120'510.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Aktien neu:
120'510 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 02.07.2019 wird eine Forderung in der Höhe von CHF 2'725'854.00 verrechnet, wofür 20'510 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 ausgegeben werden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ebnöther, Stephan Raymond, von Vorderthal, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Meilen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.