Address
Dorfstrasse 161, Parkhotel Schoenegg
3818 Grindelwald
Reports for Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG
- Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». The legal headquarters are in Grindelwald.
- The company was founded on 26.07.1988 and has 5 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 18.09.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-101.509.666.
Management (5)
newest board members
Sven Stettler,
Anja Christine Stettler-Köhler,
Hugo Max Schmid,
Urs Bacher,
Thomas Stettler
newest authorized signatories
Sven Stettler,
Anja Christine Stettler-Köhler,
Thomas Stettler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.07.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grindelwald
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.001.116-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.509.666
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung oder Vermietung von Hotel-, Restaurant- und Geschäftsbetrieben. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie Darlehen gewähren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lehmann + Bacher Treuhand AG | Meiringen | 05.10.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Scheller & Partner AG | Interlaken | 29.06.2012 | 04.10.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005839824, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG, in Grindelwald, CHE-101.509.666, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 09.10.2020, Publ. 1004996385).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stettler, Heinz, von Eggiwil, in Grindelwald, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stettler, Sven, von Eggiwil, in Gurzelen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004996385, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG, in Grindelwald, CHE-101.509.666, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2018, Publ. 1004470192).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stettler-Köhler, Anja Christine, von Eggiwil, in Gunten (Sigriswil), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Grindelwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stettler, Heinz, von Eggiwil, in Grindelwald, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stettler, Thomas, von Eggiwil, in Gunten (Sigriswil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Grindelwald, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bacher, Urs Kurt, von Fahrni, in Meiringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1004470192, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stettler Hotel + Restaurant AG, in Grindelwald, CHE-101.509.666, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 29.07.2016, Publ. 2980695).
Domizil neu:
Parkhotel Schoenegg, Dorfstrasse 161, 3818 Grindelwald.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scheller & Partner AG (CHE-108.328.551), in Interlaken, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lehmann + Bacher Treuhand AG (CHE-105.798.216), in Meiringen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.