Branches (1)
Reports for Stettler AG Biel Studen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stettler AG Biel Studen
- Stettler AG Biel Studen with its legal headquarters in Studen BE is active. Stettler AG Biel Studen operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The company was founded on 07.02.2005.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 21.06.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Stettler AG Biel Studen is the following: CHE-112.225.374.
- On the same address as Stettler AG Biel Studen there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: AG Belagsfräsen Biel Studen, Belagsgeräte AG Biel Studen, CPK Bautechnik AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Lukas Rieser,
Reto Schärer,
Anastas Suleski,
Alexander Blöchlinger,
Stephan Bruschi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Studen (BE)
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.016.344-5
UID/VAT
CHE-112.225.374
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Bauarbeiten, Sanierungen, Werkstatt- und Garagenarbeiten und andere in diesem Zusammenhang stehenden Tätigkeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder andere Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Geschäftszweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder direkt oder indirekt mit ihm in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 14.02.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stettler AG, Biel
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stettler AG Biel Studen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006063367, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stettler AG Biel Studen, in Studen (BE), CHE-112.225.374, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 23.02.2024, Publ. 1005968970).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der TSB Tief- und Strassenbau AG Biel Studen, in Studen (BE) (CHE-108.813.450), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 13.06.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 503'807.67 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 402'063.44 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da dieselbe Aktionärin sämtliche Aktien der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1005968970, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stettler AG Biel Studen, in Studen (BE), CHE-112.225.374, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2023, Publ. 1005725999).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schärer, Florian, von Wynigen, in Gerolfingen (Täuffelen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schärer, René, von Wynigen, in Mörigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rieser, Lukas, von Schwarzenburg, in Lyss, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Schüpfen, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005725999, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stettler AG Biel Studen, in Studen (BE), CHE-112.225.374, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2021, Publ. 1005289655).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heutschi, Pascal Ramon, von Balsthal, in Büren an der Aare, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hürlimann, Kurt Andreas, von St. Gallenkappel, in Lengnau bei Biel (Lengnau BE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wolf, Thomas, von Lengnau (BE), in Arch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.