Reports for Stebler Glashaus AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stebler Glashaus AG
- Stebler Glashaus AG is currently active and the industry «Production of metal goods». The legal headquarters are in Oensingen.
- The management of the company Stebler Glashaus AG consists of 7 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 18.02.1992.
- On the 11.12.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-101.337.282.
Management (7)
newest board members
Dr. Urs Heinz Rickenbacher,
Svenja Lara Stebler,
Pascal Olivier Froidevaux,
Markus Stebler,
Anita Stebler-Kellenberger
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Urs Heinz Rickenbacher,
Tristan Brockelmanns,
Svenja Lara Stebler,
Corinne Mürner,
Pascal Olivier Froidevaux
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.02.1992
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oensingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.002.551-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.337.282
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung, Verkauf und Herstellung von Glashäusern, Glasdächern, Wintergärten, Metallbauartikel sowie verwandten Waren und Produkten; sie kann Liegenschaften erwerben und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | 11.12.2023 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Brügger Treuhand AG | Köniz | 28.10.2016 | 10.12.2023 | |
Brügger Treuhand | Köniz | 09.01.2015 | 27.10.2016 | |
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 03.01.2012 | 08.01.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stebler Glashaus AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005906304, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stebler Glashaus AG, in Oensingen, CHE-101.337.282, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2023, Publ. 1005860139).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brügger Treuhand AG (CHE-328.181.418), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Solidis Revisions AG (CHE-102.352.278), in Olten, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005860139, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stebler Glashaus AG, in Oensingen, CHE-101.337.282, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 04.08.2022, Publ. 1005534955).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Martin, von Lengnau AG, in Greng, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rickenbacher, Dr. Urs Heinz, von Zeglingen, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005534955, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stebler Glashaus AG, in Oensingen, CHE-101.337.282, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2020, Publ. 1005057782).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brockelmanns, Tristan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zofingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rothrist].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.