Reports for Stebatec AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stebatec AG
- Stebatec AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Brügg BE. Stebatec AG belongs to the industry «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments» and is currently active.
- There are 8 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 24.01.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Stebatec AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-113.961.576.
Management (8)
newest board members
Dominic Bühler,
Jonathan Brechbühl,
Michael Hesse,
Benjamin Mischler,
Kilian Hesse
newest authorized signatories
Dominic Bühler,
Jonathan Brechbühl,
Michael Hesse,
Benjamin Mischler,
Kilian Hesse
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.12.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brügg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.040.702-1
UID/VAT
CHE-113.961.576
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Verkauf, die Planung, Herstellung, Realisierung von Abwassermess- und Regelanlagen sowie die Elektroplanung und Steuerungstechnik. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oer sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt zu fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Grenchen | 01.05.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grimm + Ruchti Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 03.10.2016 | 30.04.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stebatec Messtechnik GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stebatec AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005659884, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stebatec AG, in Brügg, CHE-113.961.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 04.11.2020, Publ. 1005014548).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Biland, Tanja, von Beatenberg, in Wengi b. Büren (Wengi), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005014548, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stebatec AG, in Brügg, CHE-113.961.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 01.05.2019, Publ. 1004620643).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hesse, Kilian, von Basel, in Biel/Bienne, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Safnern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Brechbühl, Jonathan, von Lauperswil, in Busswil BE (Lyss), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Aarberg];
Hesse, Heinrich, von Basel, in Magglingen/Macolin (Evilard), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lüdi, Ernst, von Heimiswil, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mischler, Benjamin, von Schwarzenburg, in Wengi b. Büren (Wengi), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Biland, Tanja, von Beatenberg, in Wengi b. Büren (Wengi), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004620643, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stebatec AG, in Brügg, CHE-113.961.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2016, Publ. 3084985).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grimm + Ruchti Treuhand AG (CHE-108.127.260), in Burgdorf, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühler, Dominic, von Horrenbach-Buchen, in Vinelz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BDO AG (CHE-327.753.565), in Grenchen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.