Reports for Starnet24 GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Starnet24 GmbH
- Starnet24 GmbH with its legal headquarters in Boppelsen is a Limited liability company from the sector «IT services». Starnet24 GmbH is active.
- The management of the company Starnet24 GmbH, which was founded on the 15.06.2017, consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 04.05.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Starnet24 GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-326.178.115.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.06.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Boppelsen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.061.827-0
UID/VAT
CHE-326.178.115
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von IT-Dienstleistungen sowie dem dazugehörigen Support. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Starnet24 GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005464357, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Starnet24 GmbH, in Boppelsen, CHE-326.178.115, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2019, Publ. 1004621371).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Muggli, Gentijana, serbische Staatsangehörige, in Uga (ES), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Deljija, Gentijana, in Dielsdorf];
Muggli, Silvia, von Meggen, in Boppelsen, Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004621371, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Starnet24 GmbH, in Boppelsen, CHE-326.178.115, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2017, S.0, Publ. 3589475).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Muggli, Thomas Richard, von Meggen, in Dielsdorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Deljija, Gentijana, serbische Staatsangehörige, in Dielsdorf, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 3589475, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Starnet24 GmbH, in Boppelsen, CHE-326.178.115, Sonnhaldenstrasse 1, 8113 Boppelsen, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
13.06.2017.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von IT-Dienstleistungen sowie dem dazugehörigen Support. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax. Gemäss Erklärung vom 13.06.2017 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Muggli, Thomas Richard, von Meggen, in Dielsdorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.