Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Sportzentrum Prättigau AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.11.1992
Deletion from the commercial register
27.08.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Küblis
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.004.126-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.429.764
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb von Sport- und Freizeitanlagen im Prättigau, Durchführung von Anlässen im Bereich Sport, Freizeit und Kultur wie auch von Ausstellungen; die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien kaufen und verkaufen und alle weiteren Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AB-Treuhand, Boner | Malans | 08.08.2000 | 26.08.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sportzentrum Prättigau AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sportzentrum Prättigau AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6823764, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Sportzentrum Prättigau AG in Liquidation, in Küblis, CH-350.3.004.126-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2011, Publ. 6234784). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 6234784, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Sportzentrum Prättigau AG, in Küblis, CH-350.3.004.126-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 31.03.2003, S. 8, Publ. 927850).
Firma neu:
Sportzentrum Prättigau AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 23.06.2011 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Curia Treuhand AG (CH-350.3.001.799-2), in Chur, Liquidatorin;
Flütsch, Ernst, von St. Antönien, in St. Antönien, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lüscher, Christian, von Muhen, in Saas im Prättigau (Saas), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Markutt, Hans, von Klosters-Serneus, in Klosters-Serneus, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mathis, Hans Martin, von Küblis, in Küblis, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Michel, Jürg, von Grüsch, in Grüsch, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Muzzarelli-Reisinger, Stefan, von Schiers, in Küblis, Vizepräsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Vizepräsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 927850, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Sportzentrum Prättigau AG, in Küblis, Betrieb von Sport- und Freizeitanlagen im Prättigau, Durchführung von Anlässen im Bereich Sport, Freizeit und Kultur wie auch von Ausstellungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 28.03.2001, S. 2291).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hug-Nigg, Rosina, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Markutt, Hans, von Klosters-Serneus, in Klosters-Serneus, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied].