Reports for Sportgastro AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sportgastro AG
- Sportgastro AG has its legal headquarters in Bern, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of restaurants».
- The company was founded on 25.03.2002 and has 9 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 23.05.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Sportgastro AG is the following: CHE-109.526.645.
- company Sportgastro AG has 3 active trademarks, cancelled trademarks or pending applications.
- There are 8 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Aeolus Pneumo Bern AG, Comfone AG, Conmax Swiss AG.
Management (9)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Pascal Signer,
Stefan Moser,
Sven Michael Rindlisbacher,
Markus Lüthi,
Philippe Gärtner
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.03.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.4.030.402-8
UID/VAT
CHE-109.526.645
CHE-116.306.764 VAT
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung von Verpflegungs- und Restaurationsbetrieben sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen und Beratungsdienstleistungen im Bereich der Restauration. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 23.09.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sportgastro GmbH
- SCB Restaurations GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
17.03.2017 | active | 50653/2016 | |
23.08.2016 | active | 50657/2016 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Sportgastro AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005751503, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Sportgastro AG, in Bern, CHE-109.526.645, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 08.09.2022, Publ. 1005557377).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Raffainer, Raeto, von Scuol, in Herrenschwanden (Kirchlindach), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Moser, Stefan, von Arni (BE), in Kehrsatz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Signer, Pascal, von Hundwil, in Zuzwil SG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005557377, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Sportgastro AG, in Bern, CHE-109.526.645, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2019, Publ. 1004567388).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüthi, Markus, genannt Marc, von Lauperswil, in Ittigen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Lüthi, Markus genannt Marc, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Raffainer, Raeto, von Scuol, in Herrenschwanden (Kirchlindach), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rindlisbacher, Sven, von Lützelflüh, in Herrenschwanden (Kirchlindach), Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bachmann, Rolf, von Niedermuhlern, in Bolligen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Kappelen];
Gärtner, Philippe, von Entlebuch, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Herger, Thomas Heinrich, von Spiringen, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004567388, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Sportgastro AG, in Bern, CHE-109.526.645, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 11.09.2017, Publ. 3744007).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Denier, Mathias, von Bürglen (UR), in Hinterkappelen (Wohlen bei Bern), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.