Reports for Spinas AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Spinas AG
- Spinas AG is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Zuoz.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 13.12.2004.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 26.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Spinas AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.143.256.
- There are 18 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Blaisun Immobilien AG, Canossa Immobilien AG, Curtinella SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.12.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zuoz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.008.145-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.143.256
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist Erwerb, Erstellung, Verwaltung, Vermietung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften und anderen Vermögenswerten; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OPES AG | Luzern | 26.06.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fellmann & Partner AG | Zug | 25.08.2009 | 25.06.2024 | |
Höllriegl Treuhand AG | La Punt Chamues-ch | 17.12.2004 | 24.08.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Spinas AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006067793, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Spinas AG, in Zuoz, CHE-112.143.256, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 06.02.2023, Publ. 1005670854).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fellmann & Partner AG (CH-170.3.015.172-8), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OPES AG (CHE-102.372.223), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005670854, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Spinas AG, in Zuoz, CHE-112.143.256, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2023, Publ. 1005646076).
Domizil neu:
Chesa Wieser, Via Dimvih 6, 7524 Zuoz [Behördliche Umadressierung].
Publication number: HR02-1005646076, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Spinas AG, in Zuoz, CHE-112.143.256, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 01.11.2012, S.0, Publ. 6913284).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wieser, Luis Augustin, von Zuoz und Tarasp, in Zuoz, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wieser, Dr. Marc E., von Zuoz, in Zuoz, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.