Reports for Spiess energie + haustechnik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Spiess energie + haustechnik AG
- Spiess energie + haustechnik AG with its legal headquarters in Adelboden is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other construction». Spiess energie + haustechnik AG is active.
- The management of the company Spiess energie + haustechnik AG, which was founded on the 27.06.2014, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.05.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Spiess energie + haustechnik AG is the following: CHE-449.017.400.
- There are 8 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Akira Kies und Recycling Pochten AG, Burn & Künzi AG, Burn Architektur Ingenieur AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Adelboden
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.060.880-2
UID/VAT
CHE-449.017.400
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Planung, Erstellung, Ausführung und den Betrieb sämtlicher Arbeiten im Bereich der erneuerbaren Energien, thermischer Solar- und Photovoltaikanlagen, Heizungen, Rohrbau, Sanitärinstallationen, Kaminbau sowie aller damit zusammenhängenden Service- und Reparaturarbeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Geschäfte erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
COT Treuhand AG | Lyss | 02.07.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Spiess energie + haustechnik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006025330, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Spiess energie + haustechnik AG, in Adelboden, CHE-449.017.400, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 23.06.2022, Publ. 1005502533).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bloom, Marcel Robert, von Marthalen, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Holzer, Anyel, von Kandergrund, in Kandersteg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005502533, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Spiess energie + haustechnik AG, in Adelboden, CHE-449.017.400, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 01.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1851053).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spiess, Beat, von Adelboden, in Adelboden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bloom, Marcel Robert, von Marthalen, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grichting, Anton, von Leukerbad, in Wengi b. Frutigen (Reichenbach im Kandertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Adelboden, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Niederhauser, Ursula, von Bannwil, in Adelboden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Holzer, Anyel, von Kandergrund, in Kandersteg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1851053, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Spiess energie + haustechnik AG, in Adelboden, CHE-449.017.400, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, Publ. 1587043).
Domizil neu:
Erlenweg 1, 3715 Adelboden.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.