Address
Schwertrainstrasse 18
4142 Münchenstein
Reports for Soul Works Foundation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Soul Works Foundation
- Soul Works Foundation has its legal headquarters in Münchenstein and is active. It operates in the sector «Creative, artistic and entertainment services».
- The organization was founded on 02.02.2004 and has 6 persons in its management.
- On the 06.11.2014 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Soul Works Foundation is registered in the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-110.511.001.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Gisela Gasser,
Thomas Friedrich Beckmann,
Flavian Graber,
Ellen Müller,
Bryan Albert Haab
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.02.2004
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Münchenstein
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.7.007.307-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.511.001
Sector
Creative, artistic and entertainment services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unterstützung und Förderung der Kunst zum Wohl der Gesellschaft und zur Ehre Gottes. Die Stiftung ist ausschliesslich gemeinnützig tätig.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Truvag Revisions AG | Sursee | 06.11.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Kandid Ganter | Arlesheim | 15.01.2008 | 05.11.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Soul Works Foundation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1808469, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Soul Works Foundation, in Pratteln, CHE-110.511.001, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2011, Publ. 6134528).
Urkundenänderung:
19.02.2014.
Sitz neu:
Münchenstein.
Domizil neu:
Schwertrainstrasse 18, 4142 Münchenstein.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand Kandid Ganter, in Arlesheim (CH-280.1.000.620-0), Revisionsstelle;
Gysin-Wüthrich, Heidi, von Oltingen, in Rothenfluh, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Fels, Mark, von Guggisberg, in Ostermundigen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Beckmann, Thomas, von Basel, in Tramelan, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Gasser, Gisela, von Rüderswil, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Graber, Flavian, von Basel und Dornach, in Liestal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Hölstein];
Truvag Revisions AG (CHE-106.093.259), in Sursee, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6134528, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Soul Works Foundation, in Pratteln, CH-280.7.007.307-1, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 24.09.2010, S. 7, Publ. 5826024).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bücker, Mechthild, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Pratteln, Mitglied und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rink, Beat, von Basel, in Liestal, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Ellen, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Eimeldingen (DE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: 5826024, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Soul Works Foundation, in Pratteln, CH-280.7.007.307-1, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 25.04.2008, S. 4, Publ. 4448782).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Joss, Patric, von Bottenwil, in Liestal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fels, Mark, von Guggisberg, in Ostermundigen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.