Address
c/o OPTEX Treuhand AG
Rosenstrasse 2
6010 Kriens
Reports for SOTO PROPERTIES SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SOTO PROPERTIES SA
- SOTO PROPERTIES SA with its legal headquarters in Kriens is active. SOTO PROPERTIES SA operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company SOTO PROPERTIES SA consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 30.11.2000.
- The last commercial register change was made on 25.06.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.329.472.
- Campo Alto SA, chilli life moments gmbh, EGGER Holzwerkstoffe Schweiz GmbH have the same address as SOTO PROPERTIES SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.11.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-660.2.394.000-9
UID/VAT
CHE-101.329.472
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Détention de participations et réalisation d'opérations financières, ainsi que développement de projets immobiliers à l'étranger.
Auditor
Former auditor (5)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 28.11.2016 | 24.06.2024 | |
Société fiduciaire d'Expertise et de Revision SA | Genève | 15.08.2014 | 16.06.2016 | |
Fiduciaire Verifid SA | Genève | 26.01.2010 | 19.03.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SOTO PROPERTIES S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SOTO PROPERTIES SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006066108, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SOTO PROPERTIES SA, in Kriens, CHE-101.329.472, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 18.11.2019, Publ. 1004761345).
Domizil neu:
c/o OPTEX Treuhand AG, Rosenstrasse 2, 6010 Kriens. Mit Erklärung vom 10.06.2024 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Balmer-Etienne AG (CHE-107.252.508), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004761345, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SOTO PROPERTIES SA, in Luzern, CHE-101.329.472, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 20.03.2017, Publ. 3412715).
Statutenänderung:
11.11.2019.
Sitz neu:
Kriens.
Domizil neu:
c/o Herzog AG Wirtschaftsberatung und Treuhand, Rosenstrasse 2, 6010 Kriens.
Publication number: 3412715, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SOTO PROPERTIES SA, in Luzern, CHE-101.329.472, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2017, Publ. 3352189).
Domizil neu:
c/o MOORE STEPHENS LUZERN AG, Obergrundstrasse 61, 6003 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pérez Flores, Enrique, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pérez Diaz, José, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lenzburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.