Reports for SolMic AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SolMic AG
- SolMic AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Stans. SolMic AG belongs to the industry «Legal counsel» and is currently active.
- The management of the company SolMic AG, which was founded on the 18.12.2008, consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 01.11.2019.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of NW is CHE-114.640.790.
- Companies with an identical address: ARTEMIS International AG, Athena Holding AG, DANA International AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Stans
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.032.982-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.640.790
Sector
Legal counsel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung und Bewirtschaftung von Patenten, Verkauf, Vertrieb von und Handel mit Pharma-, Nutra-, Agro- und Cosme-Ceuticals für den Human- und Veterinärbereich; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tharo Revisions AG | Volketswil | 11.01.2013 | 24.10.2017 | |
Horwath Revision AG | Zürich | 24.12.2008 | 10.09.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SolMic AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004750279, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
SolMic AG, bisher in Zug, CHE-114.640.790, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2018, Publ. 4107981).
Statutenänderung:
22.10.2019.
Sitz neu:
Stans.
Domizil neu:
Dorfplatz 7, 6370 Stans.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schönfeld, Dr. Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wangen-Brüttisellen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stählin, Thomas, von Lachen, in Volketswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Freygner, Dr. Sylvia Susanna, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Beckenried, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004750426, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SolMic AG, in Zug, CHE-114.640.790, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2018, Publ. 4107981). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Stans im Handelsregister des Kantons Nidwalden eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Zug von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 4107981, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SolMic AG, in Zug, CHE-114.640.790, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 07.12.2017, Publ. 3916639).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Renning, Kai, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zorneding (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.