Reports for Socratos AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Socratos AG
- Socratos AG has its legal headquarters in Reinach BL, is active and operates in the sector «IT services».
- The management of the company Socratos AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 02.07.2015.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 08.11.2016.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-145.426.821.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.07.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Reinach (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.019.123-8
UID/VAT
CHE-145.426.821
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung und Bereitstellung von Online-Dienstleistungen für Bildung sowie Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und des Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Grundstücke, Urheberrechte, Patente und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Socratos Ltd
- Socratos SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Socratos AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3149657, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Socratos AG, in Reinach (BL), CHE-145.426.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 07.07.2015, Publ. 2253511).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bozhenkov, Iaroslav, russischer Staatsangehöriger, in St. Petersburg (RU), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2253511, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Socratos AG (Socratos SA) (Socratos Ltd), in Reinach BL, CHE-145.426.821, Therwilerstrasse 40a, 4153 Reinach BL, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
26.06.2015.
Zweck:
Entwicklung und Bereitstellung von Online-Dienstleistungen für Bildung sowie Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und des Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Grundstücke, Urheberrechte, Patente und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.06.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Popov, Maxim, von Reinach BL, in Reinach BL, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bozhenkov, Iaroslav, russischer Staatsangehöriger, in St. Petersburg (RU), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Mitrokhin, Artem, russischer Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.