Address
rue des Philosophes 6
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains
Reports for Société immobilière Yverdonna SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société immobilière Yverdonna SA
- Société immobilière Yverdonna SA from Yverdon-les-Bains operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The management has one active person registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 09.09.2014. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-100.452.779.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.11.1938
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Yverdon-les-Bains
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.156.820-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.452.779
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Opérations immobilières.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Burlet S.A. en liquidation | Yverdon-les-Bains | <2004 | 14.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société immobilière Yverdonna S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société immobilière Yverdonna SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1704855, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société immobilière Yverdonna S.A., à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-100.452.779 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
rue des Philosoephes 6, 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains. Bonnevaux Christiane n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Bonnevaux Natacha, qui n'est plus présidente, reste administratrice unique avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 5393808, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société immobilière Yverdonna S.A., à Yverdon-les-Bains, CH-550-0156820-6 (FOSC du 06.09.2005, p. 17/3005864). Statuts modifiés le 23 novembre 2009 sur des points non soumis à publication. Bonnevaux Claude n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvelles administratrices avec signature individuelle:
Bonnevaux Christiane, à Yverdon-les-Bains, et Bonnevaux Natacha, à Sergey, présidente, toutes deux de Baulmes. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 23 novembre 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Fiduciaire Burlet S.A. n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: 3005864, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société immobilière Yverdonna S.A., à Yverdon-les-Bains, CH-550-0156820-6 (FOSC du 27.12.2000, p. 8843).
Nouvelle adresse:
rue des Philosophes 4, c/o Claude Bonnevaux. Bonnevaux Marguerite n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Bonnevaux Claude, de Baulmes, à Yverdon-les-Bains.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.