Address
c/o XANDY MANAGEMENT SA
Rue des Prés de la Scie 7
1920 Martigny
Reports for Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi SA
- Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi SA is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Martigny.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 16.01.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.496.472.
- There are 26 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Abate Céline, AC/DS Electricité Sàrl, Avancis Sàrl.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jürg Stäubli,
Dr. Kaloyan-Dimitre Stoyanov,
Fabien Boson,
Denis Boivin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.01.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Martigny
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.001.065-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.496.472
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Étude et développement d'installations sportives, notamment du golf en Suisse et à l'étranger; participation à toutes sociétés ou activités convergentes
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Anagest Révision SA | Villars-sur-Glâne | 27.02.2009 | 15.01.2023 | |
Controlgest SA en liquidation | Fribourg | <2004 | 26.02.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005653369, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi S.A., à Vérossaz, CHE-101.496.472, société anonyme (No. FOSC 194 du 06.10.2022, Publ. 1005577623).
Modification des statuts:
21.11.2022.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi SA.
Nouveau siège:
Martigny.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o XANDY MANAGEMENT SA, Rue des Prés de la Scie 7, 1920 Martigny.
Autres adresses:
[biffé: c/o BDO SA , Rte de la Corniche 2, 1066 Epalinges, Case postale 7690, 1002 Lausanne].
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 21.11.2022, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Anagest Révision S.A., à Villars-sur-Glâne (CH-217-0136583-0), organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005577623, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi S.A., à Vérossaz, CHE-101.496.472, société anonyme (No. FOSC 94 du 16.05.2022, Publ. 1005474776).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Buchi, Jacques, de Turbenthal, à Pierrafortscha, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Stoyanov, Kaloyan-Dimitre, de Lausanne, à Lausanne, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Stäubli, Jürg, de Regensdorf, à Prangins, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Boson, Fabien, de Fully, à Koh Samui (TH), administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005474776, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Société de Développement du Golf des Dents du Midi S.A., à Vérossaz, CHE-101.496.472, société anonyme (No. FOSC 100 du 27.05.2021, Publ. 1005194868).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Stoyanov, Kaloyan-Dimitre, de Lausanne, à Lausanne, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.