Address
c/o Roland Dayen
Rue Centrale 25
1964 Conthey
Reports for Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA
- Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA with its legal headquarters in Conthey is active. Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- The management of the company Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA consists of 7 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 17.10.1907.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 28.08.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-100.894.605.
Management (7)
newest board members
Kerstin Nicole Chambovey-Rapillard,
Carole Chantal Udry,
Philippe André Jules Germanier,
Jessie Coppey-Vergères,
Josué Coudray
newest authorized signatories
Carole Chantal Udry,
Philippe André Jules Germanier,
Roland Dayen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1907
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Conthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.001.827-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.894.605
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes opérations de commerce inhérentes à une société de consommation et société vinicole, notamment l'achat et la vente de denrées alimentaires, vins, outils agricoles, engrais, ouverture de magasins détaillant les articles ci-dessus, tenue de débits de boissons
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey
- Société de Communication la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005825259, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA, à Conthey, CHE-100.894.605, société anonyme (No. FOSC 53 du 16.03.2022, Publ. 1005428671).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Rapillard, Claude, de Conthey, à Conthey, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Chambovey-Rapillard, Kerstin Nicole, de Conthey, à Conthey, administratrice, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005428671, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA, à Conthey, CHE-100.894.605, société anonyme (No. FOSC 44 du 04.03.2020, Publ. 1004844965).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Roland Dayen, Rue Centrale 25, 1964 Conthey.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Jacquemet, Denis, de Conthey, à Conthey, président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Germanier, Philippe André Jules, de Conthey, à Conthey, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux];
Udry, Carole Chantal, de Conthey, à Conthey, vice-présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administratrice, sans droit de signature];
Coppey-Vergères, Jessie, de Conthey, à Hérémence, administratrice, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004844965, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société de Consommation la Ménagère et Société vinicole de Conthey SA, à Conthey, CHE-100.894.605, société anonyme (No. FOSC 100 du 26.05.2016, p.0, Publ. 2853727).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Vergères, Eddy, de Conthey, à Conthey, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Trincherini, Roland, de Conthey, à Conthey, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Germanier, Philippe André Jules, de Conthey, à Conthey, vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, sans droit de signature];
Coudray, Josué, de Conthey, à Conthey, administrateur, sans droit de signature;
Germanier, Philippe, de Conthey, à Conthey, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.