Reports for Société Coopérative Seitsemäs
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société Coopérative Seitsemäs
- Société Coopérative Seitsemäs with its legal headquarters in Sierre is a Cooperative from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Société Coopérative Seitsemäs is active.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 05.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization Société Coopérative Seitsemäs is registered under the UID CHE-192.282.479.
- On the same address as Société Coopérative Seitsemäs there are 16 other active companies registered. These include: 5 Star Management SA, AKTS Communications SA, AKTS Engineering SA.
Management (3)
newest members of the administration
Mathieu Truffer,
Florent Crettenand,
Félix Aimé Gheorghe Di Lenardo
newest authorized signatories
Mathieu Truffer,
Florent Crettenand,
Félix Aimé Gheorghe Di Lenardo
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.01.2024
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Sierre
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.5.023.887-0
UID/VAT
CHE-192.282.479
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société coopérative a pour but d'acquérir, dans un cadre académique, les compétences et les connaissances nécessaires à l'obtention du Bachelor HES-SO en économie d'entreprise au travers de la conception de projets, d'apprentissages par l'action et de collaboration sous forme de mandats avec des entreprises externes. La société coopérative peut exercer d'autres activités qui ont un rapport avec le but de la société coopérative ou qui encouragent son but directement ou indirectement.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société Coopérative Seitsemäs
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006048941, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société Coopérative Seitsemäs, à Sierre, CHE-192.282.479, société coopérative (No. FOSC 9 du 15.01.2024, Publ. 1005934649).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bieri, Fabian Gaetan, de Schangnau, à Sion, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Zürcher, Simon, de Trubschachen, à Cottens (FR), vice-président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Dias Ramos, Alexandre, de Monthey, à Monthey, membre et secrétaire de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Di Lenardo, Félix Aimé Gheorghe, de Villeneuve (VD), à Le Landeron, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Truffer, Mathieu, de St. Niklaus, à Savièse, vice-président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Crettenand, Florent, de Isérables, à Fully, membre et secrétaire de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR01-1005934649, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société Coopérative Seitsemäs, à Sierre, CHE-192.282.479, Technopôle 1, 3960 Sierre, société coopérative (Nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
14.12.2023.
But:
La société coopérative a pour but d'acquérir, dans un cadre académique, les compétences et les connaissances nécessaires à l'obtention du Bachelor HES-SO en économie d'entreprise au travers de la conception de projets, d'apprentissages par l'action et de collaboration sous forme de mandats avec des entreprises externes. La société coopérative peut exercer d'autres activités qui ont un rapport avec le but de la société coopérative ou qui encouragent son but directement ou indirectement.
Parts sociales:
Aucune.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par écrit. Durée limitée au 30.06.2026.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Bieri, Fabian Gaetan, de Schangnau, à Sion, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Zürcher, Simon, de Trubschachen, à Cottens (FR), vice-président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Dias Ramos, Alexandre, de Monthey, à Monthey, membre et secrétaire de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 14.12.2023, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.