Reports for Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin
- Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Courrendlin.
- Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin has 5 persons entered in its management.
- On the 22.05.2023 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization's UID is CHE-102.274.448.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
José Pedro Esteves Peres Lopes,
Martine Luana Ciocca-Pastore,
Patrick Jacques Wahlen,
Joëlle Marie Louise Richard-Allimann,
Michel André Rihs
newest authorized signatories
Martine Luana Ciocca-Pastore,
Patrick Jacques Wahlen,
Michel André Rihs
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.05.1955
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Courrendlin
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.5.001.802-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.274.448
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Procurer à ses membres des logements sains et à des prix raisonnables par l'achat de terrains ou droits de superficie et la construction de maisons d'habitation.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société coopérative de construction l'Avenir Courrendlin
- Société coopérative de constructions l'Avenir Courrendlin
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005751264, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin, à Courrendlin, CHE-102.274.448, société coopérative (No. FOSC 210 du 30.10.2018, Publ. 1004487240).
Modification des statuts:
04.04.2023. [Statuts modifiés le 04.04.2023 sur des points non soumis à publication.].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Froidevaux, Claude, de Le Bémont JU, à Courrendlin, vice-président du conseil, avec signature collective à deux;
Paupe, Clément, de Soubey, à Courrendlin, membre du conseil, sans droit de signature;
Comte, David Alfred Bernhard, de Châtillon (JU), à Courrendlin, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Chételat, Bernard Jean Marie, de Val Terbi, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature;
Telesca, Angelo, ressortissant italien, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Wahlen, Patrick Jacques, de Rubigen, à Courrendlin, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Esteves Peres Lopes, José Pedro, ressortissant portugais, à Courrendlin, vice-président de l'administration, sans droit de signature;
Ciocca-Pastore, Martine Luana, de Montfaucon, à Courroux, membre et secrétaire de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Rihs, Michel André, de Safnern, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature];
Richard-Allimann, Joëlle Marie Louise, de Val-de-Ruz, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004487240, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin, à Courrendlin, CHE-102.274.448, société coopérative (No. FOSC 64 du 04.04.2016, Publ. 2758089).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Steiner, Gilles, de Vellerat, à Courrendlin, président du conseil, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Comte, David Alfred Bernhard, de Châtillon (JU), à Courrendlin, président de l'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: Comte, David, membre du conseil, sans droit de signature];
Chételat, Bernard Jean Marie, de Val Terbi, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature;
Rihs, Michel André, de Safnern, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature;
Telesca, Angelo, ressortissant italien, à Courrendlin, membre de l'administration, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: 2758089, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Société coopérative d'habitation l'Avenir Courrendlin, à Courrendlin, CHE-102.274.448, société coopérative (No. FOSC 135 du 15.07.2008, Publ. 4574324).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Beyeler, Jean, de Wahlern, à Courrendlin, membre du conseil, sans droit de signature;
Cuttat, Jean-Claude, de Rossemaison, à Courrendlin, membre du conseil, sans droit de signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.