Address
c/o Jean-Bernard Bapst
Route du Château 1
1782 Cormagens
Reports for Société coopérative des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs
- Société coopérative des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs with its legal headquarters in Cormagens is active. Société coopérative des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- The management consists of 5 persons. The organization was founded on 01.01.1914.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.05.2010.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of FR is CHE-103.330.003.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Manfred Herren,
Jean-Louis Barras,
André Perler,
Jacques Pierre Antoine Pittet,
Eric Brand
newest authorized signatories
Manfred Herren,
Jean-Louis Barras,
André Perler,
Jacques Pierre Antoine Pittet,
Eric Brand
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1914
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
La Sonnaz
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.150.081-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.330.003
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Sauvegarder par le moyen de l'entraide coopérative les intérêts de ses associés en cherchant à tirer le meilleur parti possible de leur lait et en favorisant le développement technique de l'industrie laitière.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5633354, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs, à La Sonnaz, CH-217-0150081-1, sauvegarder par le moyen de l'entraide coopérative les intérêts de ses associés en cherchant à tirer le meilleur parti possible de leur lait, etc. Société coopérative. (FOSC du 16.11.2007, p. 7).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Société coopérative des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs (raison de commerce complétée d'office selon l'art. 176 ORC). Bapst Jean-Bernard, Brügger Maurice et Nussbaumer Bruno ne sont plus membres du comité, leur signature est radiée. Barras Jean-Louis, vice-président inscrit, est nommé président. Brand Eric, membre du comité inscrit, est maintenant domicilié à Düdingen. Herren Manfred, de Neuenegg, à Marly, est nommé vice-président, Perler André, de Senèdes, à Granges-Paccot, est nommé membre du comité, et Pittet Jacques Pierre Antoine, de Sâles (FR) et Romanens, à Matran, est nommé membre du comité tous trois avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 4203550, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs, à Fribourg, CH-217-0150081-1, sauvegarder par le moyen de l'entraide coopérative les intérêts de ses associés en cherchant à tirer le meilleur parti possible de leur lait, etc. Société coopérative. (FOSC du 06.04.2006, p. 9). Siège transféré à La Sonnaz. Cormagens, Route du Château 1, c/o Jean-Bernard Bapst. Statuts modifiés le 08.03.2007. Haymoz Erich n'est plus membre du comité, sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: 3322516, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société des producteurs de lait de Fribourg et environs, à Fribourg, CH-217-0150081-1, sauvegarder par le moyen de l'entraide coopérative les intérêts de ses associés, etc. Société coopérative. (FOSC du 05.06.2003, p. 4). Bourguet Bernard, Birbaum Pierre, et Stirnimann Jean-Pierre ne sont plus membres du comité, leur signature est radiée. Bapst Jean-Bernard, inscrit, maintenant domicilié à Granges-Paccot, est nommé président, Barras Jean-Louis, de Chénens, à Marly, est nommé vice-président, et Brand Eric, d'Ursenbach, à Tafers, est nommé secrétaire-caissier, tous trois avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.