Reports for Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici
- Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici in Yverdon-les-Bains is a Cooperative from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici is active.
- Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 02.10.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-315.722.894.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Séverine Cerf,
Lionel Marmier,
Doris Sfar,
Romuald Ackermann
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.07.2016
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Yverdon-les-Bains
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.168.653-9
UID/VAT
CHE-315.722.894
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Par l'action commune et la coresponsabilité de ses membres, la coopérative a pour but de fournir à ces derniers des logements sûrs à des loyers modérés et de les conserver. Elle vise à offrir des logements pour toutes les couches de la population, notamment les ménages à condition modeste, les familles, les personnes handicapées et âgées. Elle favorise la vie commune, le sens des responsabilités ainsi que la solidarité, selon les principes figurant dans sa charte (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005850225, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-315.722.894 (FOSC du 29.07.2016, p. 0/2981533). Nussbaum Christine n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Crevoisier Clément et Strambini Nicolas ne sont plus administrateurs. Cerf Séverine, de Saulcy, à Yverdon-les-Bains, vice-présidente, avec signature collective à deux, et Marmier Lionel, de Estavayer, à Yverdon-les-Bains, sans signature, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: 2981533, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative de construction et d'habitation La Maison d'Ici, à Yverdon-les-Bains, rue d'Orbe 37, 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-315.722.894. Nouvelle société coopérative.
Statuts:
6 juillet 2016.
But:
par l'action commune et la coresponsabilité de ses membres, la coopérative a pour but de fournir à ces derniers des logements sûrs à des loyers modérés et de les conserver. Elle vise à offrir des logements pour toutes les couches de la population, notamment les ménages à condition modeste, les familles, les personnes handicapées et âgées. Elle favorise la vie commune, le sens des responsabilités ainsi que la solidarité, selon les principes figurant dans sa charte (pour but complet cf. statuts). Parts sociales de CHF 100 et CHF 300.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique.
Administration:
Sfar Doris, de Bleienbach, présidente, Ackermann Romuald, de Bourrignon, Crevoisier Clément, de Lajoux (JU), Strambini Nicolas, du Clos du Doubs, les quatre à Yverdon-les-Bains, et Nussbaum Christine, d'Yverdon-les-Bains, à Lutry, tous avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 15 juillet 2016, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.