About Sitewalk Establishment
- Sitewalk Establishment with its legal headquarters in Schaan is active. Sitewalk Establishment operates in the sector «IT services».
- The management of the company Sitewalk Establishment consists of 0 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 28.04.2017.
- Companies with the same address as Sitewalk Establishment: Amann Architektur, avoris Personal Aktiengesellschaft, Bauelemente Otto Hilti Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaan
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language)
Der Handel mit Hard- und Software des gesamten Computerbereiches Handel mit Food- und Nonfood-Artikeln. Entwicklung/Programmierung von Hard- und Software; Internet-Installation,- Entwicklung, -Betreuung und Betreib; Betreiben eines Rechencenters; Schulung und Beratung (Consulting) im Bereich Informatik.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for Sitewalk Establishment
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 20224484, (1)
Handelsregister 28.04.2017, Sitewalk Establishment, Schann (FL-0001.529.558-0) Anstalt Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu: Im alten Riet 153, 9494 Schaan.
Publication number: 20224111, (1)
Handelsregister 13.04.2017, Sitewalk Establishment, Schann (FL-0001.529.558-0) Anstalt Statutenänderung: 03.04.2017.
Sitz neu:
Schaan. Neufassung der Statuten lt. Beschluss des Inhabers der Gründerrechte vom 03.04.2017.
Publication number: 20209488, (1)
Handelsregister 29/04/2016, Sitewalk Establishment, Mauren (FL-0001.529.558-0) Anstalt Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: Ritter, Gebhard, StA: Liechtenstein, 9493 Mauren, Präsident und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Ritter, Verena, StA: Liechtenstein, 9493 Mauren, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Ritter, Marcel, StA: Liechtenstein, 9493 Mauren, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Preite, Daniel Giuseppe, StA: Liechtenstein, 9494 Schaan, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].